Indian president ministers list
Web30 mei 2024 · Prime Minister and also in-charge of: Ministry of Personnel, Public Grievances and Pensions; Department of Atomic Energy; Department of Space; and. All important policy issues; and all other portfolios not allocated to any Minister. 2. Amit Shah. Home Minister. 3. Rajnath Singh. Defence Minister. 4. Web9 sep. 2024 · DR. ZAKIR HUSAIN: Zakir Husain Khan was an Indian politician and economist born on the 8th of February 1897. Until his death in 1969, he served as the third president of India between 1967 to 3rd of May 1969 when he died in office. Vice President of India List From 1947 to 2024.
Indian president ministers list
Did you know?
Web8 jul. 2024 · NEW DELHI: Prime Minister Narendra Modi expanded his Union Cabinet on Wednesday, bringing in 36 new faces and promoting seven existing ministers. As many as 12 ministers were dropped from the new ... WebThe Current Prime Minister of India is Narendra Modi. Presidents of India List Till 2024. Who is the Prime Minister of India? The Prime Minister of India is the Head of the …
WebThis is a chronologically ordered list of the prime ministers, from the earliest to the most recent. [Test your knowledge of India’s prime ministers with this quiz.] Jawaharlal Nehru … Web17 jan. 2024 · Indian President. Presidents of India: India got its long-awaited independence from British rule in the year 1947, after over 150 years of cruel British rule, India finally managed to break free of the clutches. Dr. Rajendra Prasad was elected as the first President of India. The President of India is also known as the first citizen of India. Dr.
WebPresident, is published for general information: - 1. President 2. Vice-President 3. Prime Minister 4. Governors of States within their respective States 5. Former Presidents 5A. Deputy Prime Minister 6. Chief Justice of India Speaker of Lok Sabha 7. Cabinet Ministers of the Union. Chief Ministers of States within their respective States Web14 jan. 2024 · Prime Minister is formally appointed by the president. Jawahar Lal Nehru, the first prime minister of India was appointed on 15th August 1947 and Narendra Damodardas Modi is the current prime minister of India. Just for an update, Draupadi Murmu has become the 15th President of India on 21st July 2024.
WebSecond Prime Minister of India- Lal Bahadur Shastri (1964-1966) Lal Bahadur Shastri was an Indian politician who served as the Second Prime Minister of India.Relatively new to the high office, he led the country successfully through Indo-Pakistan War in 1965.He popularized the slogan ‘Jai Jawan Jai Kisan’, recognizing the need for self-sustenance …
WebJawaharlal Nehru was India's first prime minister, serving as prime minister of the Dominion of India from 15 August 1947 until 26 January 1950, and thereafter of the Republic of … morphology of marchantiaWebIn 1962,Dr. Rajendra Prasad was also honored withone of the highest civilian honors of India, i.e., Bharat Ratna. 2nd. Dr. Sarvepalli Radhakrishnan. 1962-67. Dr. Sarvepalli Radhakrishnan, the 2 nd President of Independent India, … morphology of nymphaea lotusWeb29 mrt. 2024 · 11 January 1966, 24 January 1966. 13 days. Only man to have twice served as acting prime minister of India. 5. Indira Gandhi. (1917–1984) 24 January 1966 to 24 March 1977. 11 years, 59 days. The Indian prime … minecraft how to build a bedWeb20 jan. 2024 · Vanita Gupta President-elect Joe Biden nominated Vanita Gupta to serve as Associate Attorney General. An Indian-American, Gupta would be the first woman of … minecraft how to build a beach houseWebTwelve ministers have resigned including IT Minister Ravi Shankar Prasad, Health Minister Harsh Vardhan, Environment Minister Prakash Javdekar, Education Minister Ramesh … morphology of myelin and myelinationWeb8 sep. 2024 · The President is the head of the Indian State. The president is referred to as the first citizen of India. All executive actions of the Government of India are formally taken in the name of the President. List of Presidents of India PDF (1947 to 2024) Name Tenure; Start Date Closing date; Dr. Rajendra Prasad: 26 January 1950: 13 May ... morphology of oxide scales formed on titaniumWeb28 dec. 2024 · Download All Indian Presidents – Tenure PDF list – 1947-2024: Download List of Indian Presidents PDF. Download GK for Competitive exams. Also download List of all Indian Prime ministers PDF. Download GK Free App. List of presidents of India PDF from 1947 to 2024: Present President is Ram Nath Kovind. Indian President’s tenure is … morphology of milk fish