WebJul 19, 2024 · Michael J. Kennedy named to Hawaiian Electric Industries board of directors /PRNewswire/ -- Michael J. Kennedy, an innovative leader with extensive … WebNov 5, 2024 · HONOLULU, Nov. 5, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Stressing the urgency of the global effort to slow climate change, Hawaiian Electric, a subsidiary of Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc. (NYSE: HE ), has set ...
Did you know?
WebNov 30, 2024 · Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc., or HEI, recently named Elisia Flores, CEO and vice chair of L&L Franchise, Inc., as the newest member of its board of … WebShelee Kimura is the president and chief executive officer of Hawaiian Electric, which serves 95% of Hawaii’s population on the islands of Oahu, Hawaii, Maui, Lanai and Molokai and …
WebFeb 12, 2024 · HONOLULU, Feb. 12, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc. (NYSE: HE) ("HEI" or the "Company") today announced the appointment of Eva … WebMay 7, 2024 · HONOLULU, May 6, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Hawaiian Electric Industries (NYSE: HE) (HEI) announced today that Jeff Watanabe, chairman of HEI's board of directors, retired from the board at the company ...
WebJan 3, 2024 · HONOLULU, Jan. 3, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc. (HEI) (NYSE: HE ), the parent company to Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc. (Hawaiian Electric) and American Savings Bank, F ... WebMay 7, 2024 · Toby Taniguchi, president and chief operating officer of KTA Super Stores and a longtime business and community leader on Hawaii Island, was appointed to the board of directors of Hawaiian Electric. Taniguchi of Hilo oversees the operations of the island’s largest supermarket chain, which was established in 1916 in Waiakea by the …
WebAdvocating for families during times of medical crisis. We're delighted to acknowledge our Board of Directors who, along with RMHC staff, manage and guide us in our accomplishments in the community. Our dedicated Board Members contribute countless hours to ensure the successful and sustainable operation of our charity.
WebScott Seu is president and chief executive officer of HEI, the parent company of Hawaiian Electric, American Savings Bank and Pacific Current. Prior to assuming his current role in January 2024, Seu was president … cane belt railroadWebJul 28, 2016 · Next, Parks and Kaya sought out Alm with the request that he approach Hawaiian Electric’s board of directors with the notion that the company needed to reduce its use of oil to generate ... cane bentwood chairsWebOct 6, 2024 · The company said the appointments of Seu and Kimura came as part of a multi-year succession planning process undertaken by the boards of directors of HEI, Hawaiian Electric and American Savings ... cane bedhead perthWebMicah A. Kane Independent Director: Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc., Menlo College, Na Ku Pa'A O Kuhio, American Savings Bank, FSB (Honolulu, Hawaii), Kamehameha Schools, Department of Hawaiian ... cane berrong footballWebEric Yeaman. Eric Yeaman is chairman of Alexander & Baldwin, as of October 1, 2024. He has served as an independent director since 2012. Yeaman is managing partner of Hoku Capital LLC. From June 2015 to August 2024, he served as president and chief operating officer of First Hawaiian, Inc., as well as First Hawaiian Bank, the state’s largest ... caneberry subgroup 13-07aWebOct 5, 2024 · Scott Seu, president and CEO of Hawaiian Electric, HEI's largest subsidiary, will be named HEI's new chief executive, effective Jan. 1, 2024. He will also be appointed to the HEI board of directors and become the chair of the American Savings Bank board of directors, replacing Lau on those boards, also effective Jan. 1, 2024. cane bentwood rockerWebNov 29, 2024 · HONOLULU, Nov. 29, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Elisia Flores, a recognized business leader with extensive local and national experience in corporate finance and international franchising, has been... cane bestia